Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0117
    (SB0220)
Consumer Protection - Television Service Providers - Missed AppointmentsDelegate BranchIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0122Commercial Law - Automotive Repair Facilities - Tire RepairsDelegate DavisIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0126 / CH0350Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - ScopeDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 350Economic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0187Consumer Protection - Health Clubs - Surety Bond RequirementsDelegate Miller, W.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0316
    (SB0374 / CH0246)
Consumer Protection - Children's Online Privacy ProtectionDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0332
    (SB0185)
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0334 / CH0295
    (SB0589 / CH0294)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase TransactionsDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295Economic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0497
    (SB0852)
Consumer Protection - Sales of Goods and Services - Receipt RequirementsDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0785
    (SB0375 / CH0247)
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act - ScopeDelegate Washington, A.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0814Commercial Law - Debt Collection - Attachment FeesDelegate NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0878Consumer Protection - Store Credit Cards for Rebates and Returned Merchandise - Required NoticeDelegate Turner, V.In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0917Real Property - Property Used for Methamphetamine Production - Disclosure and QuarantineDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
HB0960
    (SB0859)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1110Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required NoticeDelegate KramerIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1157
    (SB0432)
Consumer Protection - Consumer Debt Collection - Disclosure RequirementsDelegate HuckerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1167Consumer Protection - Credit Cards - Surcharge on Sales Transactions - ProhibitionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1212
    (SB0709)
Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - RestrictionsDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1215 / CH0408Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - StudyDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1218Consumer Protection - Payment by Credit Card - Prohibition of SurchargeDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1219Consumer Protection - Required Notice by Financial Institutions - Nonpublic Personal InformationDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1297 / CH0330
    (SB0897 / CH0329)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsDelegate ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1469Consumer Protection - Consumer Goods Offered at a Sale Price - Rain ChecksDelegate Turner, F.In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
SB0116Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet SalesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0185
    (HB0332)
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0220
    (HB0117)
Consumer Protection - Television Service Providers - Missed AppointmentsSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0234Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's CountySenator CurrieIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0374 / CH0246
    (HB0316)
Office of the Attorney General - Workgroup on Children's Online Privacy ProtectionSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 246Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0375 / CH0247
    (HB0785)
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act - ScopeSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 247Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0376Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0432
    (HB1157)
Consumer Protection - Consumer Debt Collection - Disclosure RequirementsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0589 / CH0294
    (HB0334 / CH0295)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase TransactionsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 294Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0709
    (HB1212)
Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - RestrictionsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0852
    (HB0497)
Consumer Protection - Sales of Goods and Services - Receipt RequirementsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0859
    (HB0960)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0897 / CH0329
    (HB1297 / CH0330)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB1043Commercial Law - Acceleration of Loan Indebtedness Due to Death - ProhibitedSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledFinance

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.