Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0098
    (SB0154 / CH0042)
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - ProhibitionDelegate AroraVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0244
    (SB0776)
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory PracticesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0480 / CH0301
    (SB0508 / CH0300)
Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's CountyDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 301Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0580Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required NoticeDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0652Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - RestrictionsDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0676Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - ProhibitionDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0704 / CH0277
    (SB0160 / CH0276)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting ExtensionDelegate VaughnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 277Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0723 / CH0421Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - RequirementsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0788Mobile Phone Companies - Third-Party Vendor Billing - RestrictionsDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0913Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act)Delegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0924
    (SB0950)
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required NoticeDelegate AroraIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1032Consumer Debt Collection - Statute of Limitations (Maryland Zombie Debt Act)Delegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1272Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security FreezesDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1311Motor Vehicle Insurance - Aftermarket Parts - Warranty RequirementsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0154 / CH0042
    (HB0098)
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - ProhibitionSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Finance
1/22/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0160 / CH0276
    (HB0704 / CH0277)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting ExtensionSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 276Finance
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0508 / CH0300
    (HB0480 / CH0301)
Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's CountySenator CurrieApproved by the Governor - Chapter 300Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0585 / CH0307Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad FaithSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 307Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0776
    (HB0244)
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory PracticesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0950
    (HB0924)
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required NoticeSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.