Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0131 / CH0096Commercial Law - Nondisparagement Clauses in Consumer Contracts - ProhibitionDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Economic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0295Electricity - Explanation of Bill ChargesDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0305Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required NoticeDelegate SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0439 / CH0485Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door SalesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0502Cable Television - Equipment RentalsDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0529Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - ProhibitionDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0718 / CH0114Consumer Protection - Asset Recovery for Exploited Seniors ActDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0782
    (SB0665)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required NoticesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
HB0783Consumer Protection - Collection and Sale of Consumer Debt - RestrictionsDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0903Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and ResalesDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB1159
    (SB0773)
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - RestrictionsSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1266
    (SB0881)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and ResalesDelegate FrickIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1415Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - EnforcementDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1450 / CH0393
    (SB0471 / CH0392)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset RepealDelegate VaughnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Economic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1451Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate VaughnIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1491
    (SB0771 / CH0579)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - RestrictionsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0029Protection of Information by Businesses - Definition of Personal InformationSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0037Commercial Law - Security Freezes - Fees for Active Duty Military Service MembersSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0471 / CH0392
    (HB1450 / CH0393)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset RepealSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 392Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0665
    (HB0782)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required NoticesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0771 / CH0579
    (HB1491)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - RestrictionsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 579Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0773
    (HB1159)
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - RestrictionsPresidentIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0881
    (HB1266)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and ResalesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0953State Fire Marshal - Unauthorized Billing - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryFinance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1114Consumer Protection - Sale of Bedding by Merchants - LimitationsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1132Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and FeeSenator MannoIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.