Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0212 / CH0827
    (SB0270 / CH0828)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required NoticesDelegate WaldstreicherEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827Economic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0362Consumer Protection - Recurring Automatic Orders - Notice of Method of Contract CancellationDelegate ConawayIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0959 / CH0094
    (SB0929 / CH0093)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door SalesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 94Economic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0965
    (SB0552)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - ModificationsDelegate Howard, S.In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0974 / CH0518
    (SB0525)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Economic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1058Business Regulation - Home Improvement ContractsDelegate Miller, W.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1114
    (SB0892)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing SystemsDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1134 / CH0781
    (SB0884 / CH0018)
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection CommissionDelegate FrickEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1166
    (SB0893)
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive ConsiderationDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1306Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - EnforcementDelegate FisherIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1499Consumer Protection - Bank Overdraft Plans - RequirementsDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0270 / CH0828
    (HB0212 / CH0827)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required NoticesSenator LeeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0470Consumer Protection - Scanning Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0525
    (HB0974 / CH0518)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsSenator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0552
    (HB0965)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - ModificationsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0647Consumer Protection - Disclosure of Social Security Number - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0681 / CH0086Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - LimitationSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 86Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0884 / CH0018
    (HB1134 / CH0781)
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection CommissionSenator RosapepeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0892
    (HB1114)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing SystemsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0893
    (HB1166)
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive ConsiderationSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0929 / CH0093
    (HB0959 / CH0094)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door SalesSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0950Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - ExemptionsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1200Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017Senator RosapepeIn the House - Referred Economic MattersFinance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:53 A.M.