Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0635
    (SB0837)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer ContractsDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEconomic Matters
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0648Maryland Consumers' RightsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0673
    (SB0022)
Debt Collection - Exemptions From AttachmentDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB0710 / CH0676
    (SB0202 / CH0677)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and FeesDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 676Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0740 / CH0825
    (SB0693 / CH0826)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain NamesDelegate ClippingerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0848 / CH0480Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting AgenciesChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0937Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - RegistrationDelegate FlanaganIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsEconomic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1080Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know ActDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1090 / CH0515Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018Delegate AfzaliApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1285Consumer Protection - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Security Freezes - Call CenterDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1366Schedule I Controlled Dangerous Substances - Advertisement - ProhibitedDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1372Consumer Protection - Consumer Contracts Renewal - RestrictionsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1506 / CH0794Office of the Attorney General - Securities Commissioner - Asset Recovery for Exploited SeniorsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 794Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1584Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - ModificationsDelegate Howard, S.In the Senate - Reassigned to FinanceEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
HB1634 / CH0731
    (SB1068 / CH0732)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Delegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1654Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net NeutralityDelegate FrickIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
HB1655Commercial Law - Privacy and Net Neutrality ProtectionsDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0022
    (HB0673)
Debt Collection - Exemptions From AttachmentSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
SB0202 / CH0677
    (HB0710 / CH0676)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Notice and FeesSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 677Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0693 / CH0826
    (HB0740 / CH0825)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain NamesSenator FeldmanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0837
    (HB0635)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer ContractsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1047Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:02 P.M.