Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0099
    (SB0404 / CH0058)
Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing StatementDelegate AroraVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0430Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad FaithDelegate CardinVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0564
    (SB0522 / CH0302)
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds TransfersDelegate OlszewskiVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1158
    (SB0898)
Tobacco Products - Unpackaged Cigars and Flavored Other Tobacco Products - RestrictionsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1370Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Refusal of Filing Office to AcceptDelegate AroraIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1435Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of RecordsDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
SB0404 / CH0058
    (HB0099)
Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing StatementSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Finance
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0522 / CH0302
    (HB0564)
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Funds TransfersSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0585 / CH0307Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad FaithSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 307Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0898
    (HB1158)
Tobacco Products - Unpackaged Cigars and Flavored Other Tobacco Products - RestrictionsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.