Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0412
    (SB0789)
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6Delegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1180
    (SB0895)
Maryland Commercial Receivership ActDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1415 / CH0841
    (SB0858 / CH0842)
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect PurchasersDelegate AndersonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841Economic Matters
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1493Commercial Law - Assertions Made in Bad Faith - ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
SB0065Commercial Law - Copyright Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad FaithSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0789
    (HB0412)
Commercial Law - Uniform Commercial Code - Repeal of Title 6Senator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0858 / CH0842
    (HB1415 / CH0841)
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect PurchasersSenator SmithEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0895
    (HB1180)
Maryland Commercial Receivership ActSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:58 A.M.