Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB1323Consumer Protection - Cellular Telephones - DisclosureDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1487Workgroup to Study Adopting the Uniform Voidable Transactions ActDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1544 / CH0847
    (SB0891 / CH0848)
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil PenaltySpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1614 / CH0344Public Safety - Military Service Members - Civil ReliefDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Economic Matters
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0866Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Electronic Transactions Act - RevisionsSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0891 / CH0848
    (HB1544 / CH0847)
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil PenaltyPresidentEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.