Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0312 / CH0457
    (SB0334 / CH0456)
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - NotificationDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0373
    (SB0151 / CH0193)
Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate RegulationDelegate Haddaway-RiccioVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0774
    (SB0804)
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Violence Prevention ProgramDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0898
    (SB0455)
Public Health - Abortion Survey SystemDelegate KachIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1009 / CH0398Cosmetic Surgical Facilities - RegulationDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 398Health and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
HB1042
    (SB0798 / CH0324)
Hospitals - Credentialing and Privileging Process - TelemedicineDelegate SmigielVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1062 / CH0203
    (SB0195 / CH0202)
Hospitals - Notice to Patients - Outpatient Status and Billing ImplicationsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 203Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1116
    (SB0509)
Cosmetic Surgery - RegulationDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1120Mental Hygiene Administration - Upper Shore Community Mental Health Center - Reopening and MaintenanceDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1265
    (SB0835)
Patient Safety Early Intervention ProgramsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
HB1267Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1270Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - ProhibitionDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1496Mental Hygiene Administration - Psychiatric Bed Registry - ReportDelegate RosenbergIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1501
    (SB0977)
Task Force to Evaluate Regional Health Delivery and Health Planning in Rural AreasDelegate EckardtIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1529
    (SB1057 / CH0340)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Staff Agencies - RegulationDelegate HammenIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceHealth and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0151 / CH0193
    (HB0373)
Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate RegulationSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193Finance
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0195 / CH0202
    (HB1062 / CH0203)
Hospitals - Notice to Patients - Outpatient Status and Billing ImplicationsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 202Finance
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0334 / CH0456
    (HB0312 / CH0457)
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - NotificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Finance
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0455
    (HB0898)
Public Health - Abortion Survey SystemSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0509
    (HB1116)
Cosmetic Surgery - RegulationSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0693Health - Certified Nurse-Midwives and Freestanding Birthing Centers - Certificate of Need and Practice PrivilegesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0798 / CH0324
    (HB1042)
Hospitals - Credentialing and Privileging Process - TelemedicineSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 324Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0804
    (HB0774)
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Violence Prevention ProgramSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0835
    (HB1265)
Patient Safety Early Intervention ProgramsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB0972Task Force to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern ShoreSenator PipkinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0975Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificate of Need Review - Interested PartySenator PipkinIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB0977
    (HB1501)
Task Force to Evaluate Regional Health Delivery and Health Planning in Rural AreasSenator PipkinIn the House - Favorable Report by Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1057 / CH0340
    (HB1529)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Staff Agencies - RegulationSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1073Task Force to Evaluate the Quality of Patient Care Under a Capitated Payment SystemSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1074Task Force to Evaluate the Impact of Maryland's Proposal to Maintain the Medicare WaiverSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.