Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0100 / CH0381Dental Hygienists - Practice in Long-Term Care Facilities - Repeal of Termination DateDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 381Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0271
    (SB0276)
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0298 / CH0263
    (SB0335)
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model ContractSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 263Health and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0399 / CH0398Public Health - Medical Records Charges - Medicaid EnrolleesDelegate MurphyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 398Health and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0404
    (SB0577 / CH0305)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - CemeteriesDelegate RosenbergVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0532
    (SB0432)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Database of Direct Access Employees - EstablishmentDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0534Maryland Intrastate Hospital Assistance CompactChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0710
    (SB0483 / CH0510)
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety ProgramDelegate CullisonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0806 / CH0615Health Information Exchanges - Protected Health Information - RegulationsDelegate LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 615Health and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0866Task Force to Evaluate the Quality of Patient Care Under a Capitated Payment SystemDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
HB0906Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic TestingDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
HB0963 / CH0627Hospitals - Protocol for Sexual Assault Medical Forensic Examinations and Planning CommitteeDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 627Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1072Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1144
    (SB1097)
Mental Hygiene Administration - Upper Shore Community Mental Health Center - Reopening and MaintenanceDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1253
    (SB0646)
State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need ReviewDelegate ConwayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1296 / CH0651Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Review and Reporting of Possible Misuse or Abuse of Monitored Prescription DrugsDelegate KachApproved by the Governor - Chapter 651Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1545 / CH0376
    (SB1104 / CH0375)
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Governance - Medical Center EmployeesDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 376Appropriations
3/13/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0089 / CH0018Maryland Health Care Commission - Requirement for Certificate of Need - ExceptionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 18Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0227Health - Medical Laboratories - Advertising for or Soliciting Business - Repeal of ProhibitionSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0276
    (HB0271)
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0335
    (HB0298 / CH0263)
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model ContractPresidentIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0432
    (HB0532)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Plan for Creation and Implementation of a Database of Direct Access EmployeesSenator PughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsFinance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0483 / CH0510
    (HB0710)
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0577 / CH0305
    (HB0404)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - CemeteriesSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 305Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0646
    (HB1253)
State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need ReviewSenator MiddletonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnFinance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0654 / CH0323Health - Down Syndrome - Required InformationSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0891 / CH0073Maryland Health Care Commission - Authority of Acute Care Hospitals to Provide Cardiac Surgery Services - Voluntary Relinquishment - RegulationsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 73Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1097
    (HB1144)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern ShoreSenator HersheyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1104 / CH0375
    (HB1545 / CH0376)
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Governance - Medical Center EmployeesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 375Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.