Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0256
    (SB0397)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Licensees - Duties and Immunities - EmployeesDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0327 / CH0240Health - Ambulatory Surgical Facility - DefinitionsDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 240Health and Government Operations
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0435Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Award of Grant - Study of Past Practices at State Psychiatric InstitutionsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0566 / CH0261Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Licensees Providing Services to Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Emergency ActionDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 261Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0613 / CH0263
    (SB0513)
Hospitals - Rate-Setting - Participation in 340B Program Under the Federal Public Health Service ActDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 263Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0978 / CH0112HIV Testing - Informed Consent and Pretest Requirements - ModificationDelegate LamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1006
    (SB0572)
Hospitals - Designation of CaregiversDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1053
    (SB0697)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern ShoreDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1256Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificates of Need - Application of Bed Need ProjectionsDelegate BromwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0384Mental Hygiene Community-Based Services Fund - Residential Rehabilitation ProgramsSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0397
    (HB0256)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Licensees - Duties and Immunities - EmployeesSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0513
    (HB0613 / CH0263)
Hospitals - Rate-Setting - Participation in 340B Program Under the Federal Public Health Service ActSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0572
    (HB1006)
Hospitals - Designation of CaregiversSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0596 / CH0041Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External ReviewsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0697
    (HB1053)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern ShoreSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0795Health Care Facilities - Cost of Residents' Care - Determination and Payment of FundsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.