Health Maintenance Organizations (J4)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0716 / CH0509
    (SB0617 / CH0508)
Drug Therapy Management - Physician-Pharmacist AgreementsDelegate TarrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 509Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0808
    (SB0680)
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation ClaimsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0617 / CH0508
    (HB0716 / CH0509)
Drug Therapy Management - Physician-Pharmacist AgreementsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 508Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0680
    (HB0808)
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation ClaimsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.