Workers' Compensation (K1)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0013Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - State Correctional OfficersDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0504
    (SB0186)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Compensation - Reversal or Modification of AwardDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0631 / CH0493Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Howard County Deputy Sheriffs Ho. Co. 11-16Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0693
    (SB0534)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - CompensationDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0710
    (SB0258)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and TreatmentDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0943
    (SB0257)
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - CreditDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1053
    (SB0174)
Workers' Compensation Commission - Location of Hearings - Claims Filed by Employees of Governmental AgenciesDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB1160
    (SB0441)
State Board of Physicians - Admissibility of Board Records - Workers' Compensation CommissionDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1619
    (SB0505 / CH0394)
Workers' Compensation Insurance - Premium Discount - Alcohol- and Drug-Free Workplace ProgramDelegate JacksonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0174
    (HB1053)
Workers' Compensation Commission - Location of Hearings - Claims Filed by Employees of Governmental AgenciesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0186
    (HB0504)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Compensation - Reversal or Modification of AwardSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0257
    (HB0943)
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - CreditSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0258
    (HB0710)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and TreatmentSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0441
    (HB1160)
State Board of Physicians - Admissibility of Board Records - Workers' Compensation CommissionSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0505 / CH0394
    (HB1619)
Workers' Compensation Insurance - Premium Discount - Alcohol- and Drug-Free Workplace ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0534
    (HB0693)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - CompensationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1058Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Baltimore City Deputy SheriffsSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.