Workers' Compensation (K1)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0344
    (SB0751)
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement and Workers' Compensation Benefits - OffsetsDelegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB0559
    (SB0051)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of ClaimDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0995Workers' Compensation - Covered Employees - Performance of Essential Services During State of EmergencyDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1101
    (SB0576)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional OfficersDelegate BuckelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1267Workers' Compensation - Members of Volunteer Company - Computation of Average Weekly WageDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1293
    (SB0425)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Survival of ClaimDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1294 / CH0070
    (SB0426 / CH0069)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of ClaimDelegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Economic Matters
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1315 / CH0264
    (SB0072 / CH0263)
Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating PlansDelegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 264Economic Matters
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1476 / CH0565
    (SB0867 / CH0566)
Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - PenaltyDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Economic Matters
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1484 / CH0567
    (SB0194 / CH0568)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and TreatmentDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 567Economic Matters
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0051
    (HB0559)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of ClaimSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0072 / CH0263
    (HB1315 / CH0264)
Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating PlansSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 263Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0194 / CH0568
    (HB1484 / CH0567)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and TreatmentSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 568Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0425
    (HB1293)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Survival of ClaimSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0426 / CH0069
    (HB1294 / CH0070)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of ClaimSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0466Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - 9-1-1 Director's Council (Carl Henn's Law)Senator KaganIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0576
    (HB1101)
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional OfficersSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0751
    (HB0344)
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement and Workers' Compensation Benefits - OffsetsSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 8:30 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/2/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
Finance
SB0867 / CH0566
    (HB1476 / CH0565)
Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - PenaltySenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 566Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.