Unemployment Insurance (K2)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0700
    (SB0679 / CH0574)
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail TechniciansDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1334
    (SB0777 / CH0697)
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Messenger Service BusinessDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1605Unemployment Insurance - Safe Harbor - EstablishmentDelegate AdamsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1633
    (SB1145)
Unemployment Insurance - Maximum Benefit - IncreaseDelegate GlennIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0074 / CH0336Unemployment Insurance - Effect of Retirement Payments on Eligibility for Benefits - RevisionChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 336Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0084 / CH0337Unemployment Insurance - Calculation and Application of Table of Rates - RevisionChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 337Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0086 / CH0339Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Actively Seeking Work Requirement - RepealChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0090 / CH0342Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for FraudChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0679 / CH0574
    (HB0700)
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail TechniciansSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0777 / CH0697
    (HB1334)
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Messenger Service BusinessSenator AstleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB1145
    (HB1633)
Unemployment Insurance - Maximum Benefit - IncreaseSenator MiddletonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.