Unemployment Insurance (K2)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0135 / CH0250Unemployment Insurance - Electronic Transmission of Information and Documents - AuthorityChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0137 / CH0245
    (SB0021 / CH0244)
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by AssessmentChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0139 / CH0251Unemployment Insurance - Employer Determinations - Process and Appeal RightsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0141 / CH0248
    (SB0017 / CH0249)
Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation ClosingsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 248Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1642
    (SB1169 / CH0733)
Unemployment Insurance - Charge of Benefits - Waiver Due to Natural DisasterDelegate FlanaganIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0017 / CH0249
    (HB0141 / CH0248)
Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation ClosingsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 249Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0021 / CH0244
    (HB0137 / CH0245)
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by AssessmentChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0070 / CH0262Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Youth Sports WorkersSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0417Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment for Nail Technicians - RepealSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1169 / CH0733
    (HB1642)
Unemployment Insurance - Charge of Benefits - Waiver Due to Natural DisasterSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 733Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1192Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance - Independent Contractors and Severance PaySenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing canceledFinance

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:51 A.M.