Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 39

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0055Labor and Employment - Sick Leave Policy - RequirementDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0104Occupational Safety and Health - Good Faith Actions by Business Owners - Penalty ForgivenessDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0127
    (SB0405 / CH0046)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Overtime WagesDelegate DavisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0227 / CH0002
    (SB0278 / CH0001)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 2Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0296
    (SB0305 / CH0224)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0318Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0330
    (SB0555)
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work ContractsSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0479Labor and Employment - Payment of WagesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0547Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Chemical Information List - ExemptionDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0735
    (SB0698)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0774
    (SB0804)
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Violence Prevention ProgramDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0795 / CH0539
    (SB0757 / CH0538)
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - ComplaintsDelegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 539Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0804 / CH0548
    (SB0784 / CH0547)
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to PregnancyDelegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 548Economic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0830 / CH0141Alternatives to the General Educational Development Tests - StudyDelegate RudolphApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0955 / CH0394
    (SB0888)
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social ServicesDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Economic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1130 / CH0541
    (SB0758 / CH0540)
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - EstablishmentDelegate BarnesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFinance
HB1204
    (SB0683)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1283Prevailing Wage Enforcement ActDelegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1317Labor and Employment - Division of Labor and Industry - AppropriationsDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB1318Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings TrustDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB1331Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1335Labor and Employment - Short-Term Disability Insurance for Pregnancy - RequirementDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB1486Procurement - Occupational Safety and Health PrequalificationDelegate McHaleIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic Matters
SB0012 / CH0163Labor and Employment - Leave - Deployment of Family Members in the Armed ForcesSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 163Finance
1/24/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0051Employment Contracts - Noncompetition Covenant - Conditions Affecting EnforcementSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
1/24/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0278 / CH0001
    (HB0227 / CH0002)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 1Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0305 / CH0224
    (HB0296)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 224Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0405 / CH0046
    (HB0127)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Overtime WagesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0553 / CH0499Tipped Employees - Payments or Deduction from Wages - ProhibitionSenator GettyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 499Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0555
    (HB0330)
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work ContractsSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0668Labor and Employment - Right to WorkSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0683
    (HB1204)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0698
    (HB0735)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0757 / CH0538
    (HB0795 / CH0539)
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Discrimination Against Employee - ComplaintsSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 538Finance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0758 / CH0540
    (HB1130 / CH0541)
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - EstablishmentSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 540Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic Matters
SB0784 / CH0547
    (HB0804 / CH0548)
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to PregnancySenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 547Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0804
    (HB0774)
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Violence Prevention ProgramSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0888
    (HB0955 / CH0394)
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator GaragiolaVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB1051Maryland Private Sector Employees Pension Plan Task ForceSenator RosapepeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.