Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0004Maryland Wage and Hour Law - State Minimum Wage Rate - IncreaseDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0192Occupational Safety and Health - Inspections and Assessments of Civil Penalties - LimitationsDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
HB0229
    (SB0604 / CH0043)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for InternsDelegate DumaisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0249Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0345 / CH0493Labor and Employment - Flexible Leave - Use of Leave for Family IllnessDelegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 493Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
HB0404
    (SB0279)
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0421
    (SB0312)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustDelegate FrickIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB0478Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - ProhibitionDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB0528Labor and Employment - Wage Records, Wages, and Paydays - RequirementsDelegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0882Maryland Workers Fairness ActDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB0946Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest ClausesDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0969
    (SB0688)
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0985Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - EstablishmentDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0988
    (SB0833)
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Penalties and Liquidated DamagesDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1027Labor and Employment - Overwork Prohibition ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1051
    (SB0424)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1066Labor and Employment - Nondisclosure Agreements - ProhibitionDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
HB1072
    (SB0784)
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on Engagement in Lawful Activities - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
HB1226 / CH0120Apprenticeship and Training - Replacement of Obsolete ReferencesChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Economic Matters
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1244 / CH0123Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - Name ChangeChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 123Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0003State Minimum Wage Rate - Exceptions - Social Service Nonprofit OrganizationsSenator GettyIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceFinance
SB0040
    (HB0385)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0279
    (HB0404)
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0312
    (HB0421)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0424
    (HB1051)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0425Labor and Employment - Wage Disclosure and Discussion ProtectionSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0604 / CH0043
    (HB0229)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for InternsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0659Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Tip Credit - RepealSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0688
    (HB0969)
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0784
    (HB1072)
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on Engagement in Lawful Activities - ProhibitionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0833
    (HB0988)
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Penalties and Liquidated DamagesSenator BensonIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersFinance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0907Ironworkers - Apprenticeship Program and Certification Program and Use of Certified Ironworkers on Construction ProjectsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledFinance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.