State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0128
    (SB0188)
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - ExceptionDelegate FrankIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0194Optional Retirement Program - Payment of Benefits - CriteriaDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0231
    (SB0235 / CH0477)
Governor - Pension and Health BenefitsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0377State Retirement and Pension System - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services Employees - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal ConvictionDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0609Employees' Pension System - Cash Balance Plan OptionDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0612
    (SB0575 / CH0304)
State Retirement and Pension System - Code Simplification and ClarificationDelegate GriffithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
HB0630
    (SB0576 / CH0180)
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Penalty for Failure to Submit CertificationDelegate GriffithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
HB0655State Retirement and Pension System - Member Contribution Rate - ReductionDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0708
    (SB0665 / CH0188)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate SerafiniVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0805 / CH0553
    (SB0763 / CH0552)
Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of PersonnelDelegate Haddaway-RiccioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 553Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0839Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Expanded Eligibility Delegate SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1046 / CH0635City of College Park Employees - Participation in the Employees' Pension System PG 404-14Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 635Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
HB1047 / CH0636Employees' Pension System - Prince George's County Officials - Membership PG 418-14Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
HB1171State Retirement and Pension System - Correctional, Police, and Law Enforcement Officers - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal ConvictionDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1201
    (SB0403)
State and Local Retirement and Pension Systems - Assignment of Benefits to Trust for Disabled IndividualsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1209
    (SB0916)
State Retirement and Pension System - Parole and Probation Employees - Membership in Correctional Officers' Retirement SystemDelegate DeBoyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1251
    (SB0921)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustDelegate HuckerIn the House - Reassigned to Economic Matters and AppropriationsEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB1274Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
HB1483 / CH0578
    (SB1082 / CH0577)
State Reformed Contributory Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Prior Eligibility ServiceDelegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 578Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HJ0001General Assembly Compensation Commission - Recommendations - Employees' Pension SystemDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0188
    (HB0128)
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - ExceptionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
SB0235 / CH0477
    (HB0231)
Governor - Pension and Health BenefitsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 477Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
SB0403
    (HB1201)
State and Local Retirement and Pension Systems - Assignment of Benefits to Trust for Disabled IndividualsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
SB0575 / CH0304
    (HB0612)
State Retirement and Pension System - Code Simplification and ClarificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Budget and Taxation
2/6/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0576 / CH0180
    (HB0630)
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Penalty for Failure to Submit CertificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Budget and Taxation
2/6/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0665 / CH0188
    (HB0708)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 188Budget and Taxation
2/20/2014 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0763 / CH0552
    (HB0805 / CH0553)
Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of PersonnelSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 552Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0885State Pension System - Concessionaires and Other Private Entities - ParticipationSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0916
    (HB1209)
State Retirement and Pension System - Parole and Probation Employees - Membership in Correctional Officers' Retirement SystemSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0921
    (HB1251)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/20/2014 - 8:30 a.m.
Finance
SB0939 / CH0362State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Leave of Absence - Extension of Purchase PeriodSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1082 / CH0577
    (HB1483 / CH0578)
State Reformed Contributory Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Prior Eligibility ServiceSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 577Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.