State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0030Frederick County Public Charter School Program - EstablishmentDelegate SchulzIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansWays and Means
HB0076
    (SB0102 / CH0010)
State Retirement and Pension System - Accumulated Contributions of Nonvested Former MembersDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0077
    (SB0103 / CH0150)
Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and ReemploymentDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0078
    (SB0076 / CH0007)
State Retirement and Pension System - Noncontributory Pension Benefit - DefinitionDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0079
    (SB0104 / CH0011)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership and Eligibility for RetirementDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2015 - 9:15 a.m.
HB0217 / CH0230
    (SB0191)
State Retirement and Pension System - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - ClarificationDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0380State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - ExceptionDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0421
    (SB0312)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustDelegate FrickIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB0569State Police Retirement System and Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment of RetireesDelegate JacksonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0694 / CH0268
    (SB0286)
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - MembershipDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0907
    (SB0726 / CH0195)
Employees' Pension System - Town of Sykesville - Service CreditDelegate Miller, W.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2015 - 9:15 a.m.
HB1121
    (SB0364 / CH0163)
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to EmploymentDelegate BromwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0076 / CH0007
    (HB0078)
State Retirement and Pension System - Noncontributory Pension Benefit - DefinitionSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 7Budget and Taxation
2/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0102 / CH0010
    (HB0076)
State Retirement and Pension System - Accumulated Contributions of Nonvested Former MembersSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Budget and Taxation
2/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0103 / CH0150
    (HB0077)
Judges' Retirement System - Membership, Benefits, and ReemploymentSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 150Budget and Taxation
2/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0104 / CH0011
    (HB0079)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership and Eligibility for RetirementSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11Budget and Taxation
2/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0165State Retirement and Pension System - Constitutional Officers - Forfeiture of BenefitsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
SB0191
    (HB0217 / CH0230)
State Retirement and Pension System - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - ClarificationSenator PetersIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0286
    (HB0694 / CH0268)
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - MembershipSenator MannoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0312
    (HB0421)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0364 / CH0163
    (HB1121)
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to EmploymentSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 163Budget and Taxation
3/6/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0432 / CH0032Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Combination of Service - ClarificationSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 32Budget and Taxation
3/6/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0442 / CH0033Employees' Pension System - Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Eligible Governmental UnitSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 33Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0485Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to EmploymentSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0560 / CH0182Employees' Pension System - Optional MembershipSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 182Budget and Taxation
3/6/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0639 / CH0189Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - ExemptionsSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 189Budget and Taxation
3/6/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0640State Retirement and Pension System - Actuarial Stress TestsSenator SerafiniIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0726 / CH0195
    (HB0907)
Employees' Pension System - Town of Sykesville - Service CreditSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Budget and Taxation
3/6/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.