State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0036 / CH0580Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 580Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0164 / CH0248
    (SB0176 / CH0249)
Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for AllowanceDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
HB0354
    (SB0299 / CH0579)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers (Hometown Heroes Act of 2018)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0414Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0629
    (SB0568)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Dependent Participation in the Maryland Rx ProgramDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0822 / CH0774Personnel and Pensions – Phased Retirement PlanDelegate KrimmApproved by the Governor - Chapter 774Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
HB0993 / CH0769
    (SB0898)
Maryland Pension Risk Mitigation ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 769Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
HB1012 / CH0727
    (SB0899 / CH0728)
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment DivisionDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 727Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
HB1018 / CH0723
    (SB0784 / CH0724)
Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and CalculationDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 723Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
HB1019
    (SB0699 / CH0509)
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Former Members - Member ContributionsDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
HB1020
    (SB0178)
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - OathDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB1042 / CH0784Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefit Cap IncreaseDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 784Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
HB1049 / CH0725
    (SB0895 / CH0726)
State Police Retirement System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - AlterationsDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 725Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
HB1165Military Service Credit - EligibilityDelegate Young, P.In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB1182
    (SB0988)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB1625Elected and Public Officials - Crimes - Pension Forfeiture (Clean Up Annapolis Act)Delegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HJ0007
    (SJ0009)
General Assembly Compensation Commission - Legislative Pension Plan - Closure to Current and Future MembersDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
SB0031State Retirement and Pension System - State Employees and Teachers - BenefitsSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
SB0063Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
SB0176 / CH0249
    (HB0164 / CH0248)
Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for AllowanceSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 249Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0178
    (HB1020)
State Retirement and Pension System – Board of Trustees – OathSenator GuzzoneVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0299 / CH0579
    (HB0354)
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – MembershipPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 579Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0378Military Service Credit - EligibilitySenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
SB0510Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
SB0568
    (HB0629)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Dependent Participation in the Maryland Rx ProgramSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
SB0620Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Former Baltimore City Jail EmployeesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing canceledBudget and Taxation
SB0699 / CH0509
    (HB1019)
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection – Former Members – Member ContributionsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 509Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0784 / CH0724
    (HB1018 / CH0723)
Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and CalculationSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 724Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0895 / CH0726
    (HB1049 / CH0725)
State Police Retirement System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - AlterationsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 726Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0898
    (HB0993 / CH0769)
Maryland Pension Climate Change Risk ActSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
SB0899 / CH0728
    (HB1012 / CH0727)
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment DivisionSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 728Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0988
    (HB1182)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
SB1001 / CH0596Employee Benefits – State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program and Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings ProgramSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 596Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1252 / CH0469Employees' and Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment Earnings LimitationSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 469Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SJ0009
    (HJ0007)
General Assembly Compensation Commission - Legislative Pension Plan - Closure to Current and Future MembersSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing canceledBudget and Taxation

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:56 P.M.