Counties - Generally (L1)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0432
    (SB0316)
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and EmployeesFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB0685
    (SB0633 / CH0512)
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost ShareDelegate GriffithIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0778 / CH0332
    (SB0899 / CH0331)
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 332Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0914County Income Tax Disparity Grants - AlterationsDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report AdoptedAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1145 / CH0668Task Force to Study Energy Generation in Prince George's County PG 416-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 668Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0316
    (HB0432)
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and EmployeesSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0583Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0633 / CH0512
    (HB0685)
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost ShareSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0707Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption from County Tax LimitationsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0899 / CH0331
    (HB0778 / CH0332)
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0940Baltimore County and Carroll County - Authority to Place Boundary MonumentsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.