Counties - Generally (L1)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0022Baltimore City - Prohibition on Ordinance Eliminating or Limiting Duty to RetreatDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
HB0066Local Government - Dog Licenses - RequiredDelegate TarrantIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0180 / CH0126
    (SB0076 / CH0125)
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale AuthorizationDorchester County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 126Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0213Local Government - Permit Review and Explanation of DenialDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0365 / CH0225
    (SB0254)
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 225Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
HB1261
    (SB0397)
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web SitesDelegate FrankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB1279
    (SB0627)
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax LimitationsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1385Washington County Gaming Commission - Membership - Conflict of InterestWashington County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1473
    (SB1010)
Domestic Animals - Sterilization and Life-Sustaining Care of Cats - Determination of DangerousnessDelegate KachIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0076 / CH0125
    (HB0180 / CH0126)
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale AuthorizationSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 125Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0254
    (HB0365 / CH0225)
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionSenator GlassmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0397
    (HB1261)
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web SitesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0465 / CH0171Washington County Gaming Commission - Membership - Conflict of InterestSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 171Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0627
    (HB1279)
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax LimitationsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0781 / CH0338Environment - Recycling - Special EventsSenator MontgomeryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0905Community-Based Developmental Disabilities and Mental Health Services Providers - County Minimum Wage ReimbursementSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1010
    (HB1473)
Domestic Animals - Sterilization and Life-Sustaining Care of Cats - Determination of DangerousnessSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.