Counties - Generally (L1)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0233Task Force to Study Health and Safety Standards for Rental Housing in Prince George's County PG 410-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB0637
    (SB1004)
Counties - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Hearing and Approval RequirementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0638
    (SB1005)
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - AgreementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0686 / CH0824
    (SB0742 / CH0028)
Income Tax - Wynne Case - Local Government Repayments to the Local Reserve AccountDelegate LuedtkeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 824Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1079Frederick County and Prince George’s County – Building and Housing Codes – Materials Used to Board or Secure Residential PropertyDelegate HolmesIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB1246
    (SB0954)
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned PropertyDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1458District Court – County Zoning Violation – AppealsCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1459 / CH0118Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax RevenuesCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0742 / CH0028
    (HB0686 / CH0824)
Income Tax - Wynne Case - Local Government Repayments to the Local Reserve AccountSenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0954
    (HB1246)
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned PropertySenator EckardtIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1003Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - LimitationsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB1004
    (HB0637)
Counties - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Hearing and Approval RequirementsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1005
    (HB0638)
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - AgreementsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:02 P.M.