Municipal Corporations (L3)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0639 / CH0627Maryland-Washington Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel MC/PG 111-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 627Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1126Environment - Well Drilling - Notification to MunicipalitiesDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1136
    (SB0523)
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web SitesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0523
    (HB1136)
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web SitesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1022Prince George's County - Green Business ZonesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation
Finance
SB1049 / CH0602Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean CitySenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 602Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.