Municipal Corporations (L3)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0025Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee VotingDelegate GeorgeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0213Local Government - Permit Review and Explanation of DenialDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0422
    (SB0991)
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - ProhibitedDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0489Municipalities - Incorporation Referendums - Special ElectionsDelegate SchulzIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0827 / CH0103Municipal Elections - Campaign Finance Reports - Submission of Copies to the State Board of ElectionsDelegate SummersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1261
    (SB0397)
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web SitesDelegate FrankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
SB0269 / CH0050Local Government - Municipal Elections - Voting Offenses, Penalties, and EnforcementSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0397
    (HB1261)
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web SitesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0438 / CH0501Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State BallotSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0991
    (HB0422)
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - ProhibitedSenator KingIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.