Municipal Corporations (L3)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0277Municipalities - Authority to Serve Citations for Violations of County LawsDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0736Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - EstablishmentDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0852 / CH0280Local Government - Municipal Elections - Tie VotesDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 280Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1024 / CH0731Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1161 / CH0135Municipalities - Boat Docking and Storage - User Fees - Authorized UsesDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1475Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings - Registration, Remediation, and TaxationDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB1622
    (SB0760)
Municipalities - Municipal Elections - Regulations Governing Write-In CandidatesDelegate HixsonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0248Municipalities - Vacant or Blighted Buildings - Registration and RemediationSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0326Municipal Elections - Certificates of Candidacy - Proof of FilingSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0760
    (HB1622)
Municipalities - Municipal Elections - Regulations Governing Write-In CandidatesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.