Municipalities (L3)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0209Prince George's County - Asset Transfer for Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - Municipal Agreements PG 401-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB0390Montgomery County - Damascus - Zoning and Land Use Jurisdiction on Incorporation PG/MC 104-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0410 / CH0129Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority PG/MC 108-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 129Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0615 / CH0285Municipalities - Charter Amendments - ProceduresDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 285Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0638
    (SB1005)
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - AgreementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0829 / CH0746
    (SB0730 / CH0745)
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee VotingDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1131
    (SB1016)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Expansion of Participating UnitsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB1246
    (SB0954)
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned PropertyDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0730 / CH0745
    (HB0829 / CH0746)
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee VotingSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 745Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0954
    (HB1246)
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned PropertySenator EckardtIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1005
    (HB0638)
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - AgreementsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1016
    (HB1131)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying OrganizationsSenator RosapepeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

May 15, 2018 1:18 P.M.