Bi-County Agencies (L5)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0585 / CH0438Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking MC/PG 109-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0628Prince George's County - Municipal Zoning Authority MC/PG 111-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0652 / CH0446Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - Commissioner Terms MC/PG 105-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 446Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0653Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulation of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles MC/PG 114-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0675 / CH0448Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Performance Audit MC/PG 104-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 448Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0677Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Independent Review Board - Refunds MC/PG 106-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0708Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Members - Annual Salary MC/PG 108-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0910Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 116-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEnvironment and Transportation
3/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0938
    (SB0564 / CH0365)
Prince George's County - Maryland-Washington Regional District - Fairness in Zoning MC/PG 112-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1016Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Certified County-Based Business Participation Program MC/PG 113-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1234 / CH0474Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Assistance Program MC/PG 107-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Environment and Transportation
3/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0564 / CH0365
    (HB0938)
Prince George's County - Maryland-Washington Regional District - Fairness in ZoningSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.