Bi-County Agencies (L5)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB1024 / CH0731Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1025Prince George's County - Land Use - Zoning Powers and Review PG/MC 111-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB1027Prince George's County - Land Use Permit Review - Consolidation PG/MC 110-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB1123 / CH0500Maryland-Washington Metropolitan District - Boundaries - City of Greenbelt PG/MC 117-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 500Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1124Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures PG/MC 118-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB1125Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Members - Annual Salary PG/MC 106-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB1128 / CH0501Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing PG/MC 113-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1129 / CH0502Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commissioners Appointed From Montgomery County - Qualifications PG/MC 116-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 502Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1131Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Budget Approval PG/MC 104-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB1132Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Board of Ethics - Subpoena Power PG/MC 105-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB1133Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commissioners - Compensation Study PG/MC 107-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB1140Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Ratemaking Structure - Review by Office of Legislative Audits PG/MC 108-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1198 / CH0304Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Extraordinary Development District PG/MC 109-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1552Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 115-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)Environment and Transportation
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1575Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Rates PG/MC 119-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.