Bi-County Agencies (L5)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0319 / CH0562Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of Supplier Diversity and Inclusion and Minority Business Enterprise Program MC/PG 106-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0320Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0321 / CH0361Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Audit Committee and Office of the Inspector General MC/PG 110-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 361Environment and Transportation
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0323Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Rezoning of the Jesuit Property MC/PG 107-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB0326
    (SB0889)
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures MC/PG 105-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB0335 / CH0563Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 104-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 563Environment and Transportation
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0336Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Rates MC/PG 101-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB0355 / CH0561Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 561Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1356Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Entry Into Public Roadways - Regulations by Municipal CorporationsDelegate GilchristIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB1570Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority MC/PG 111-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0889
    (HB0326)
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment ProceduresSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:43 P.M.