Local Government - Generally (L6)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 39

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0252State Development Plan - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0256 / CH0610Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Direct Judicial ReviewFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0364 / CH0107Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs (Connor's Law)Delegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0409 / CH0521
    (SB0443)
Land Use - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CycleDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0492 / CH0473Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental UnitDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 473Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
HB0508Environment - Local Stormwater Management Charges - State PropertyDelegate CarrIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12)Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
HB0549
    (SB0145)
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - CollectionDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB0558Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2013Delegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0733 / CH0136Local Government - Cross-References and CorrectionsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0819Prudent Pension Management ActDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0949
    (SB0936)
SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support CenterDelegate BoboIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB0956
    (SB0719)
State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to EmployersDelegate Turner, V.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0959
    (SB0676 / CH0304)
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of InformationDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1076 / CH0494Counties and Municipalities - Required Legislation or Regulations - Adoption by ReferenceDelegate EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 494Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1094Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous CitationsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1138
    (SB0778)
Correctional Services - Inmate Welfare Fund - Telephone Financial AssistanceDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1170 / CH0593
    (SB0965 / CH0592)
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund WorkgroupDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 593Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1177Street Lighting - Purchase of Equipment by Local Government and TariffsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1257 / CH0674Land Use - Clarifications and CorrectionsDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1268Official Oaths - Educational Course Requirement (Maryland Oath of Office Affirmation Act)Delegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1282Agricultural Land Condemnation BoardDelegate EckardtIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1385Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Deadline ExtensionDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
HB1486Procurement - Occupational Safety and Health PrequalificationDelegate McHaleIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic Matters
SB0145
    (HB0549)
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - CollectionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0210Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2013)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0443
    (HB0409 / CH0521)
Land Use - Local Governments - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CyclesSenator DysonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0470 / CH0472Employees' Pension System - Somerset County Economic Development Commission - Eligible Governmental UnitSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 472Budget and Taxation
2/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0526 / CH0493Counties and Municipalities - Required Legislation or Regulations - Adoption by ReferenceSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0546Immunity of Local Government Officials - Prosecutions for BriberySenator FroshIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0591Governmental Procedures - Protection of Personal InformationSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0671 / CH0520Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CycleSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 520Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0676 / CH0304
    (HB0959)
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of InformationSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0719
    (HB0956)
State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to EmployersSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0778
    (HB1138)
Correctional Services - Inmate Welfare Fund - Telephone Financial AssistanceSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0936
    (HB0949)
SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support CenterSenator YoungIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB0965 / CH0592
    (HB1170 / CH0593)
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund WorkgroupSenator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 592Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
SB1016Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan PaymentsSenator FroshIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersFinance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB1065
    (HB1397)
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and EnforcementSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.