Local Government - Generally (L6)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0074State Development Plan - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0082Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous CitationsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0202 / CH0473
    (SB0186 / CH0472)
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan PaymentsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 473Economic Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0213Local Government - Permit Review and Explanation of DenialDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0365 / CH0225
    (SB0254)
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 225Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
HB0729
    (SB0979)
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0790
    (SB0595)
Local Government - Restrictions on Income-Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact ReviewDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing cancelledRules and Executive Nominations
HB0795Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty CasesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0951 / CH0625
    (SB0774)
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification RequirementsDelegate McHaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1011Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2014Delegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
HB1260
    (SB0644 / CH0069)
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open DataDelegate BarveVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1407Local Government - Restrictions on Income Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact StudyDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0186 / CH0472
    (HB0202 / CH0473)
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan PaymentsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 472Finance
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0254
    (HB0365 / CH0225)
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionSenator GlassmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0326Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2014)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0513Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty CasesSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0595
    (HB0790)
Local Government - Restrictions on Income-Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact ReviewSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0644 / CH0069
    (HB1260)
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open DataSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0774
    (HB0951 / CH0625)
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0979
    (HB0729)
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.