Local Government - Generally (L6)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0107Medical Professional Liability Insurance for Nonprofit Health Care Providers MC 4-15Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0404
    (SB0279)
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0631
    (SB0357)
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation AdjustmentDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0916Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0919 / CH0288
    (SB0551)
Land Use - Plans - Development and AdoptionDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0985Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - EstablishmentDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0989
    (SB0713)
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0171Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road PropertySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0279
    (HB0404)
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0333Calvert County - Improvements to County Roads and Related Infrastructure - "Quick-Take" CondemnationSenator MillerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0357
    (HB0631)
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation AdjustmentSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0551
    (HB0919 / CH0288)
Land Use - Plans - Development and AdoptionSenator RosapepeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0713
    (HB0989)
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.