Local Government - Generally (L6)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 42

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0078
    (SB0222)
Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local GovernmentsDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0085Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Foreclosed Property Registry - AccessDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0158
    (SB0049)
Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - SalaryDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0221Local Government – School Construction – PermitsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0234Land Use – Public Nuisance – Surety Bond Requirement (Developer Accountability Act)Delegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0240
    (SB0661)
Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment AcquisitionDelegate MoonIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0390Montgomery County - Damascus - Zoning and Land Use Jurisdiction on Incorporation PG/MC 104-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB0396
    (SB0354)
Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation FeeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0432
    (SB0545)
Public Safety - Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund - EstablishmentDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0447
    (SB1156)
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - EstablishmentDelegate BarronIn the House - First Reading Judiciary and AppropriationsJudiciary
Appropriations
HB0520
    (SB0583)
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local AuditsDelegate QueenIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0535
    (SB0407)
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - EstablishmentDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0938Federal Fair Housing Laws – Enforcement by State and Local GovernmentsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0971Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement AllowanceDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1120Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism ActivitiesDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1131
    (SB1016)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Expansion of Participating UnitsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
HB1390Land Use - Development Rights and Responsibilities AgreementsDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1400State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Employees of Qualifying OrganizationsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
HB1408Local Jurisdictions – Historic Preservation Standards – Prevention of Lethal and Life–Threatening Nontidal FloodingDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1490Local Government - Overhead Transmission Lines - Property MaintenanceDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1588Zoning Amendments – Energy Generation SystemsDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1591Solar Facilities - Siting StandardsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB1603
    (SB1109)
Task Force to Standardize Data Collection on Race and EthnicityDelegate SanchezIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1624
    (SB0764)
Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - AmountsDelegate AndertonIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1651Local Jurisdictions - Housing - Sustainable Communities - Comprehensive PlansDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1692
    (SB0760)
Land Use - Solar Electric Generating Facility Siting - Prohibition on Contiguous Parcels of Agricultural LandDelegate WestIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0049
    (HB0158)
Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - SalarySenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0222
    (HB0078)
Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local GovernmentsSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0287State Funds - Procurement of Services From Internet Service Providers - RestrictionSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0352Somerset County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing DateSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
SB0354
    (HB0396)
Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation FeeSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0407
    (HB0535)
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - EstablishmentSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0480Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority - Distribution of Local Impact GrantsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0545
    (HB0432)
Public Safety - Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund - EstablishmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0583
    (HB0520)
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local AuditsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0661
    (HB0240)
Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment AcquisitionSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0712Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - ExemptionsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceFinance
SB0760
    (HB1692)
Land Use - Solar Electric Generating Facility Siting - Prohibition on Contiguous Parcels of Agricultural LandSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0764
    (HB1624)
Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - AmountsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1016
    (HB1131)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Expansion of Participating UnitsSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1109
    (HB1603)
Task Force to Standardize Data Collection on Race and EthnicitySenator RamirezIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB1156
    (HB0447)
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - EstablishmentSenator SmithIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

February 19, 2018 8:23 P.M.