Natural Resources - Generally (M1)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0058 / CH0380
    (SB0073)
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain ViolationsDelegate Haddaway-RiccioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0118 / CH0383Task Force to Study the Impact of Ocean Acidification on State WatersDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 383Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0121
    (SB0062 / CH0010)
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Powers and Duties - Member TermsDelegate Robinson, S.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0123Program Open Space - Use of Funds - Artificial Turf SurfacesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0129 / CH0085
    (SB0407)
Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest ProvisionsDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0291Natural Resources - Tree Experts - ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0292Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0296 / CH0465
    (SB0336)
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New WildlandsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465Environmental Matters
2/5/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0299State Boat Act - Certificate of Number Fee - Altering Motor Horsepower for Fee ExemptionDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/5/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0420
    (SB0471 / CH0505)
Washington County - Off-Road Vehicle Trails - Prohibition of Establishment on Sideling HillDelegate MyersVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0582 / CH0101Licensed Tree Experts - NotificationDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 101Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0660 / CH0607
    (SB0533)
Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - Off-Highway VehiclesDelegate MyersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 607Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0711Transfer Tax Revenues - Special Fund Transfers - Two-Thirds VoteDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0865Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Rural Residential Drinking Water Protection ActDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1122
    (SB0745)
Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014Delegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1312 / CH0452Program Open Space Sites - Public AccessDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Environmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1367Natural Resources - Forests, Parks, and Recreation Areas - Posted Notice of Safety InformationDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1368
    (SB1083)
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder ExemptionDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1402Agricultural Transfer Tax - Distribution to Mel Noland Woodland Incentives FundDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1506 / CH0459Wicomico County - Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal AuthorityDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 459Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0062 / CH0010
    (HB0121)
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Powers and Duties - Member TermsSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0073
    (HB0058 / CH0380)
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain ViolationsSenator ColburnVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0094Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0336
    (HB0296 / CH0465)
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New WildlandsPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0360Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0407
    (HB0129 / CH0085)
Public Ethics - Chesapeake Bay Trust - Exemptions and Conflict of Interest ProvisionsSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0471 / CH0505
    (HB0420)
Washington County - Off-Road Vehicle Trails - Prohibition of Establishment on Sideling HillSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 505Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0533
    (HB0660 / CH0607)
Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - Off-Highway VehiclesSenator EdwardsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0535Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0745
    (HB1122)
Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014Senator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0935Department of Natural Resources Police - Transfer of Duties and Responsibilities to the Department of State PoliceSenator DysonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1083
    (HB1368)
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder ExemptionSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1116Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.