Hunting and Fishing (M2)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 39

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0091Natural Resources - Hunting - Outerwear ExceptionDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0104
    (SB0149)
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary DonationsDelegate RobinsonIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0119 / CH0110Calvert County – Hunting – Deer Management PermitsDelegate ClarkApproved by the Governor - Chapter 110Environment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0172 / CH0123Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 123Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0636Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for ProtectionDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0712Natural Resources - Wildlife Trafficking PreventionDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1118 / CH0181
    (SB0341 / CH0180)
Hunting - Required Outerwear - Daylight Fluorescent PinkDelegate AdamsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 181Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1122
    (SB0959)
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black BearsDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB1137Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster DiversDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1163Waterfowl Hunting Guide License - Guide Services for Hunting Snow Geese - ReciprocityDelegate AdamsIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1172
    (SB0558)
Oyster Poaching - Administrative PenaltiesDelegate JacobsIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1174Natural Resources - Oysters - Tolerance for Seafood DealersDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1249Crab Harvest – Start Time – Days in JulyDelegate AdamsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1284Tidal Fish Licenses - Authorization to Catch Crabs - Application RequirementsDelegate CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1338
    (SB0817)
Natural Resources - Hunting - SundaysDelegate AndertonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1426Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases and Public Shellfish Fishery AreasDelegate AdamsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
HB1429Natural Resources - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1440Natural Resources - Hunter Safety Instructors - State Park Entrance FeeDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1455Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals - ProhibitionDelegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1485Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf OwnersDelegate FisherIn the House - Passed EnrolledEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1547Natural Resources - Crabbing Authorizations - ReciprocityDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1561Natural Resources - Hunting - Outerwear ExceptionDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1693Consolidated Senior Sport Fishing License - Minimum AgeDelegate ChangIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1699
    (SB1166)
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and MammalsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1812Natural Resources - Haul Seines - Anne Arundel CountyDelegate Howard, S.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0094Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and MammalsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0112 / CH0061Natural Resources - Tidal Fish LicensesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0113 / CH0062Natural Resources - Recreational License Incentive Discount ProgramChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0149
    (HB0104)
Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Voluntary DonationsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0183Natural Resources - Electronic Licensing - Recreational License Donation Fund - DonationsSenator SimonaireIn the House - Second Reading PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0341 / CH0180
    (HB1118 / CH0181)
Hunting - Required Outerwear - Daylight Fluorescent PinkSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0558
    (HB1172)
Oyster Poaching - Administrative PenaltiesSenator SimonaireIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0747Wildlife Management - Shooting at NighttimeSenator AstleIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (14-33)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0777Aquaculture Leases - Notice - Homeowners AssociationsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0817
    (HB1338)
Natural Resources - Hunting - SundaysSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0926Natural Resources - Oyster Planting - Substrate MaterialSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0959
    (HB1122)
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black BearsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1166
    (HB1699)
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and MammalsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1237Natural Resources - Public Shellfish Fishery Area - StandardsSenator EckardtIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.