Environment (M3)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0003
    (SB0138)
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - MembershipDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0026
    (SB0133)
Community Healthy Air ActDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
1/31/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
HB0183Prince George's County Environmental Justice Commission PG 411-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB0217Prince George's County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags PG 420-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic MattersEnvironment and Transportation
Economic Matters
HB0219
    (SB0115)
Deep Creek Lake Policy and Review Board - Membership and DutiesDelegate BeitzelIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB0230
    (SB0290)
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)Delegate KormanIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersEconomic Matters
HB0304Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Elevated Blood Lead LevelsDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
SB0100Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Plans - Designation of Approval AuthorityChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0115
    (HB0219)
Deep Creek Lake Policy and Review Board – Membership and DutiesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0133
    (HB0026)
Community Healthy Air ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0138
    (HB0003)
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - MembershipSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0290
    (HB0230)
Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)Senator PinskyIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs

January 20, 2018 6:22 A.M.