Agriculture (M4)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0003Health - Milk Products - Raw Milk - Consumer-Owned LivestockDelegate HubbardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0193
    (SB0027)
Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact AnalysisDelegate ConwayIn the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0256
    (SB0294 / CH0052)
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/5/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0284
    (SB0963)
Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact AnalysisDelegate EckardtIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/5/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0576Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Diminution in Value of Real Property - Compensation Delegate FisherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0621 / CH0547
    (SB0700 / CH0546)
Registration of Pesticides - Fee Increase - Disposition of FeesDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 547Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0737State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy AnalysesDelegate ReadyIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0861
    (SB0259 / CH0287)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0905
    (SB0725)
Chesapeake Bay - Nutrient Management - Poultry Fair Share ActDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB1010Agriculture - Production and Sale of Industrial HempDelegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1076
    (SB0521)
Energy-Generating Cooperative Advisory CommitteeDelegate ConwayIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1083
    (SB0670)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - GleaningDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1285Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restricted UseDelegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB1347
    (SB0862)
Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and CatsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1392Maryland Wholesome Meat Act - Prohibitions - Equines and Equine MeatDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1437Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release - Demonstrated Financial HardshipDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1463
    (SB1020)
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - ExemptionsDelegate DavisIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1472Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - StudyDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0027
    (HB0193)
Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact AnalysisSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
SB0044Agriculture - Noxious Weeds - Reed GrassSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0070 / CH0011Agriculture - Fertilizer - Labeling and Restrictions on Use and SaleChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0071 / CH0012Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Value of EasementChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 12Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0127 / CH0036Department of Agriculture - Manure Transportation ProjectChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0176Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real PropertySenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
SB0259 / CH0287
    (HB0861)
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation FacilitiesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters
SB0294 / CH0052
    (HB0256)
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0521
    (HB1076)
Poultry Litter Energy-Generating Cooperative ProgramSenator PinskyIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
SB0670
    (HB1083)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - GleaningSenator MiddletonIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0700 / CH0546
    (HB0621 / CH0547)
Registration of Pesticides - Fee Increase - Disposition of FeesSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 546Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0725
    (HB0905)
Chesapeake Bay - Nutrient Management - Poultry Fair Share ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0862
    (HB1347)
Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and CatsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0963
    (HB0284)
Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact AnalysisSenator ColburnIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB1020
    (HB1463)
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - ExemptionsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.