Agriculture (M4)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0151Maryland Wholesome Meat Act - Prohibitions - Equines and Equine MeatDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0252
    (SB0284)
Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program - Maryland Homegrown School Lunch Week - OccurrenceDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0359
    (SB0280)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot ProgramDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0381
    (SB0257)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0536
    (SB0345)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0605
    (SB0163)
Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticide - Labeling Requirement (Pollinator Protection Act of 2015)Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0633Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation PlansDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
HB0701
    (SB0463)
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial DrugsDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0803 / CH0456Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - LegalizationDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0876Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelter Standards Act of 2015)Delegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0881
    (SB0256)
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation ActDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0886
    (SB0533)
Bay Tax Equity ActDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0995Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - ProhibitionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1019
    (SB0532)
Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB1075
    (SB0470)
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing AnimalsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB1096Agriculture - Weight and Measure Requirements - Exemption for Biodiesel Purchasing CooperativeDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0163
    (HB0605)
Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticide - Labeling Requirement (Pollinator Protection Act of 2015)Senator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0256
    (HB0881)
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation ActSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0257
    (HB0381)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0280
    (HB0359)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot ProgramSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0284
    (HB0252)
Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program - Maryland Homegrown School Lunch Week - OccurrenceSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0345
    (HB0536)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentSenator MiddletonIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0463
    (HB0701)
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial DrugsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0470
    (HB1075)
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing AnimalsSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0532
    (HB1019)
Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0533
    (HB0886)
Bay Tax Equity ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0748Deer Hunting - Crop Damage Permit - Wild VenisonSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0860Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Commercial FertilizerSenator MiddletonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0909 / CH0207Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property by Other EntitiesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 207Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.