Agriculture (M4)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0046 / CH0248Animal Control Units - Impounded Animals - IdentificationDelegate ChangApproved by the Governor - Chapter 248Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0079Health - Milk Products - Raw Milk - Consumer-Owned LivestockDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0132 / CH0614State Government - Pollinator Habitat PlansDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 614Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0211 / CH0662
    (SB0198 / CH0661)
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)Delegate HealeyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0443 / CH0105Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Agricultural or Academic ResearchDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 105Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0459 / CH0316
    (SB0389)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0494 / CH0267Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelters Standards Act of 2016)Delegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0594Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2016Delegate KramerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0599
    (SB0496)
Poultry Litter Management ActDelegate LamIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0829
    (SB0607)
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial DrugsDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0980State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Disciplinary Action Report - Publication on Web SiteDelegate GilchristIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1110
    (SB0645)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of FundsDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB1163Agriculture - Veterinary Feed Directives - Information CollectionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1462 / CH0688
    (SB0614 / CH0687)
Veterinarians, Pharmacies, and Pharmacists - Dispensing Compounded Preparations for Use by Nonfarm AnimalsDelegate BromwellEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1496Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0110 / CH0019Agriculture - Young Farmers Advisory Board - MembershipChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0112 / CH0021Pest Control Compact - RepealChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0113 / CH0022Department of Agriculture - Bees, Bee Colonies, and Used Bee Equipment - Transportation and ShipmentChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0198 / CH0661
    (HB0211 / CH0662)
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)Senator Nathan-PulliamEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0249Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot ProgramSenator MiddletonIn the House - Second Reading PassedBudget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0389
    (HB0459 / CH0316)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionPresidentIn the House - Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
SB0496
    (HB0599)
Poultry Litter Management ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0526 / CH0400Agriculture - Commercial Feed - ExemptionSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 400Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0607
    (HB0829)
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial DrugsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0614 / CH0687
    (HB1462 / CH0688)
Veterinarians, Pharmacies, and Pharmacists - Dispensing Compounded Preparations for Use by Nonfarm AnimalsSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0645
    (HB1110)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of FundsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0761Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.