Agriculture (M4)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0120 / CH0101Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product MarketingChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 101Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0130 / CH0104Maryland Wine and Grape Promotion FundChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 104Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0155 / CH0114Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement TerminationChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0216 / CH0412
    (SB0269 / CH0411)
Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From LiabilityDelegate LamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 412Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0217
    (SB0285)
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or ServitudesDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0528
    (SB0420)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0586 / CH0395
    (SB0278 / CH0396)
Maryland Farms and Families ActDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0602 / CH0787
    (SB0422 / CH0788)
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017Delegate RobinsonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 787Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0626 / CH0409Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Standards of Care and Protocol Implementation and EnforcementDelegate GilchristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0779
    (SB0719)
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017Delegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0830 / CH0755
    (SB0386)
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and ProhibitionDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 755Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0863State Agricultural and Conservation Property Interests - Solar Facilities (Right to Solar Farm)Delegate BarveIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0902Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - LegalizationDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1063 / CH0373Agriculture - Maryland Healthy Soils ProgramDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1204
    (SB0932)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Atrazine StudyDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1463 / CH0417Veterinary Practitioners - Animal Cruelty and Animal Fighting - ReportingDelegate FrushApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417Environment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0269 / CH0411
    (HB0216 / CH0412)
Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From LiabilitySenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 411Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0278 / CH0396
    (HB0586 / CH0395)
Maryland Farms and Families ActSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0285
    (HB0217)
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or ServitudesSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0386
    (HB0830 / CH0755)
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and ProhibitionSenator Nathan-PulliamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0420
    (HB0528)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017Senator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0422 / CH0788
    (HB0602 / CH0787)
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017Senator PinskyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0703 / CH0394Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Participation in the Readiness and Environmental Protection Integration ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0719
    (HB0779)
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017Senator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0730Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - FarmersSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0773Community Healthy Air ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0932
    (HB1204)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Atrazine StudySenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0975 / CH0662Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate ParcelsSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 662Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:49 A.M.