Agriculture (M4)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 39

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0026
    (SB0133)
Community Healthy Air ActDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
HB0116
    (SB0500)
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - ProhibitionDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0252Land Use - AgritourismChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0396
    (SB0354)
Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation FeeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0400Agriculture - Mosquito Control - Notification to MunicipalitiesDelegate TarlauIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0452
    (SB0389)
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - RepealDelegate CarrIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0515Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – StudyDelegate GhristIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0620County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs - Recertification and Remittance of Unexpended Funds - ExtensionsDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0698Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - EstablishmentDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0732
    (SB0675)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0870
    (SB1065)
Public Schools - Agricultural Education ProgramsDelegate ShoemakerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0980
    (SB0700)
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal RefugeDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1013
    (SB0759)
Property Tax - Benefits for Agricultural Land - Exclusion of Solar FarmsDelegate WestIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1120Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism ActivitiesDelegate ReyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1168
    (SB1125)
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface MiningDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB1221Agriculture - Nutrient Management Plans - Protection of Personal InformationDelegate GilchristIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1229 / CH0066Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Use of Land – Signs and Outdoor Advertising DisplaysDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 66Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1351Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion EventsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1360Environment - Sewage Sludge - Land ApplicationDelegate RoseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1688
    (SB0761)
Public Utilities - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Exclusion From ExemptionDelegate WestIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1692
    (SB0760)
Land Use - Solar Electric Generating Facility Siting - Prohibition on Contiguous Parcels of Agricultural LandDelegate WestIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1736
    (SB1140)
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot ReleaseDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1781Land Use – Change to Zoning Classification – LimitationDelegate Howard, S.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0133
    (HB0026)
Community Healthy Air ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0203Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Fertilizer Use on TurfSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0354
    (HB0396)
Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation FeeSenator MiddletonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0389
    (HB0452)
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - RepealSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0500
    (HB0116)
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - ProhibitionSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0571Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising DisplaysSenator BatesIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0675
    (HB0732)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018Senator HoughIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0700
    (HB0980)
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal RefugeSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0759
    (HB1013)
Property Tax - Benefits for Agricultural Land - Exclusion of Solar FarmsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0760
    (HB1692)
Land Use - Solar Electric Generating Facility Siting - Prohibition on Contiguous Parcels of Agricultural LandSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0761
    (HB1688)
Public Utilities - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Exclusion From ExemptionSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0885Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under EasementSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1065
    (HB0870)
Public Schools - Agricultural Education ProgramsSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1125
    (HB1168)
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface MiningSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRules
SB1140
    (HB1736)
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Definition of ChildSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1201Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - EstablishmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2018 4:40 P.M.