Estates and Trusts (N2)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0008
    (SB0168 / CH0196)
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and LimitsDelegate VitaleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0437
    (SB0753)
Maryland Trust ActDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0626
    (SB0196 / CH0029)
Register of Wills - SalaryDelegate MitchellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0658Estates and Trusts - Forms for Modified AdministrationDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0857 / CH0644Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived ChildDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 644Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0858 / CH0645
    (SB0170)
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance TaxDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 645Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0859 / CH0646Interests in Grantor and Qualified Terminable Interest Property TrustsDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 646Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0946Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1211 / CH0486
    (SB0489 / CH0485)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Delegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1328
    (SB0332 / CH0455)
Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State AgenciesDelegate SmigielVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
SB0029Estates and Trusts - Personal Representative - Administration of Internet-Based AccountsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0168 / CH0196
    (HB0008)
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and LimitsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0170
    (HB0858 / CH0645)
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance TaxSenator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0196 / CH0029
    (HB0626)
Register of Wills - SalarySenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 29Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0198 / CH0204Estates and Trusts - Family AllowanceSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0332 / CH0455
    (HB1328)
Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State AgenciesSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0489 / CH0485
    (HB1211 / CH0486)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Senator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0649Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - StandardsSenator GettyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0753
    (HB0437)
Maryland Trust ActSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0982Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (The Mike Cady Act)Senator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.