Estates and Trusts (N2)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0059Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0083 / CH0585
    (SB0240)
Maryland Trust ActDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 585Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0228 / CH0297
    (SB0391 / CH0296)
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - RecordsDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 297Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0570
    (SB0621)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented EstateDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0656
    (SB0321 / CH0291)
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - StandardsDelegate ReadyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0705
    (SB0940 / CH0207)
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly PersonsDelegate WaldstreicherVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1004 / CH0435Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration - ObjectionDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 435Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0023Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (Mike Cady Act)Senator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0240
    (HB0083 / CH0585)
Maryland Trust ActSenator StoneIn the House - Rereferred to JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
SB0321 / CH0291
    (HB0656)
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - StandardsSenator GettyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 291Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0391 / CH0296
    (HB0228 / CH0297)
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - RecordsSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 296Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0621
    (HB0570)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented EstateSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0681Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal ServicesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0940 / CH0207
    (HB0705)
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly PersonsSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 207Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.