Estates and Trusts (N2)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0024Estates and Trusts - Allowance for Funeral ExpensesDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0109 / CH0400Guardianship of the Person - Disabled Persons - Attorney's FeesDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 400Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0186
    (SB0101)
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0281Estates and Trusts - Elective ShareDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0293 / CH0412
    (SB0090)
Guardianship of Disabled Persons and Revocation of Advance DirectivesDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 412Health and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0531
    (SB0429)
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets ActDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0592
    (SB0415 / CH0348)
State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act)Delegate MorhaimVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0623
    (SB0418 / CH0030)
Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - ExtensionDelegate MieleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0624 / CH0443Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified AdministrationDelegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 443Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0625
    (SB0428)
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trusts - Partial Revocation by Divorce or AnnulmentDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0666 / CH0100
    (SB0417)
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trusts - Creditors' Claims - LimitationsDelegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 100Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0703 / CH0450Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - IncapacityDelegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 450Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1013Constitutional Amendment - Orphans' Court Judges - Election and Term LimitsDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1180
    (SB0831)
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationBaltimore County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1257Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate CourtDelegate BromwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0023Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (Mike Cady Act)Senator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0090
    (HB0293 / CH0412)
Guardianship of Disabled Persons and Revocation of Advance DirectivesSenator KelleyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0101
    (HB0186)
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0217 / CH0020Special or Supplemental Needs Trusts - Authorization to FundSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 20Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0415 / CH0348
    (HB0592)
State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act)Senator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0417
    (HB0666 / CH0100)
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trusts - Creditors' Claims - LimitationsSenator LeeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0418 / CH0030
    (HB0623)
Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - ExtensionSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0419Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - IncapacitySenator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0420Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified AdministrationSenator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0428
    (HB0625)
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trusts - Partial Revocation by Divorce or AnnulmentSenator LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsJudicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0429
    (HB0531)
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets ActSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0831
    (HB1180)
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationBaltimore County SenatorsIn the House - Rereferred to Health and Government OperationsJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.