Estates and Trusts (N2)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0009 / CH0245
    (SB0064)
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationBaltimore County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0043
    (SB0070)
Duties of Guardian of the Person and Visitation Between Adult Child and ParentDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0199Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate CourtDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0256Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets ActDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
HB0472 / CH0486Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Retention of Estate FilesDelegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0485Estates and Trusts - Register of Wills - Admission of Copy of Executed WillDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
HB0507 / CH0365
    (SB0239 / CH0364)
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets ActDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0512
    (SB0430)
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification RightsDelegate KittlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0541 / CH0270
    (SB0451)
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trust - Partial Revocation by Divorce or AnnulmentDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 270Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0824Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Traveling Expense Allowance and PensionCecil County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0887 / CH0563Maryland Trust Act - RepresentationDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 563Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0888 / CH0222
    (SB0571 / CH0221)
Maryland Trust Act - Nonjudicial Settlement AgreementsDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 222Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0960 / CH0439
    (SB0853 / CH0438)
Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and AccountsDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0981 / CH0391
    (SB0449 / CH0390)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Guardianship Fees - Personal Needs AllowanceDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 391Health and Government Operations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1229
    (SB0913)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1336Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of DeliveryDelegate Howard, S.In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1489
    (SB0171)
Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records CheckDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0064
    (HB0009 / CH0245)
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationBaltimore County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0070
    (HB0043)
Duties of Guardian of the Person and Visitation Between Adult Child and ParentSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0171
    (HB1489)
Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records CheckSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0239 / CH0364
    (HB0507 / CH0365)
Maryland Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets ActSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 364Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0430
    (HB0512)
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification RightsSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0449 / CH0390
    (HB0981 / CH0391)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Guardianship Fees - Personal Needs AllowanceSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Finance
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0451
    (HB0541 / CH0270)
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trust - Partial Revocation by Divorce or AnnulmentSenator LeeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0570 / CH0562Maryland Trust Act - RepresentationSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0571 / CH0221
    (HB0888 / CH0222)
Maryland Trust Act - Nonjudicial Settlement AgreementsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 221Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0853 / CH0438
    (HB0960 / CH0439)
Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and AccountsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0913
    (HB1229)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.