Estates and Trusts (N2)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0008Estates and Trusts - Notice Requirement - Method of DeliveryDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0081 / CH0666Estates and Trusts - Conditions of Disability and Incapacity - ConfinementDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 666Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0722
    (SB0881)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0735 / CH0626
    (SB0073 / CH0627)
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving SpouseDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 626Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0753 / CH0354
    (SB0793 / CH0355)
Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of BeneficiariesDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 354Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0754 / CH0356
    (SB0792 / CH0357)
Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - ExemptionsDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 356Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1165Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family RelationshipsDelegate SaabIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1331Estate Fairness Act - Inheritance Tax RepealDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1638Employee Ownership TrustsDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0073 / CH0627
    (HB0735 / CH0626)
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving SpouseSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 627Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0509 / CH0454Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalarySenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 454Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0556Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Visitation and NotificationSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0792 / CH0357
    (HB0754 / CH0356)
Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - ExemptionsSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 357Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0793 / CH0355
    (HB0753 / CH0354)
Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of BeneficiariesSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 355Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0881
    (HB0722)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB1100Intestate Estates - Inheritance by Surviving Parent - RepealSenator BrochinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:34 A.M.