Social Services - Generally (O1)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0333 / CH0367Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0632Family Investment Program - State Government Hiring Plans - ApplicationDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0834Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug TestsDelegate StocksdaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
HB0884
    (SB0686 / CH0526)
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1119 / CH0317
    (SB0752 / CH0316)
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot ProgramDelegate ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1137
    (SB0898)
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social ServicesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1333Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1449Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term LimitsDelegate ReznikIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0086 / CH0022Voluntary Placement for Former Children in Need of AssistanceChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 22Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0686 / CH0526
    (HB0884)
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot ProgramSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0752 / CH0316
    (HB1119 / CH0317)
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot ProgramSenator RobeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0898
    (HB1137)
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.