Social Services - Generally (O1)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0106 / CH0084Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program - Sunset ExtensionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 84Health and Government Operations
1/15/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0149 / CH0215Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services - Term LimitsDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 215Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0794 / CH0425
    (SB0794)
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration ProjectDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0813 / CH0427
    (SB0795)
Joint Committee on Ending HomelessnessDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0904 / CH0621Children, Youth, and Family Services - Local Management Boards and State Spending - Information Collection and ReportDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 621Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1036
    (SB0796 / CH0341)
Human Services - Interagency Council on HomelessnessDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceAppropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
HB1522 / CH0461
    (SB1107)
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary RelocationDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0021Family Investment Program - Eligibility - Drug TestingSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0794
    (HB0794 / CH0425)
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration ProjectSenator ReillyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0795
    (HB0813 / CH0427)
Joint Committee on Ending HomelessnessSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
SB0796 / CH0341
    (HB1036)
Human Services - Interagency Council on HomelessnessSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 341Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1105Temporary Cash Assistance - Termination of Benefits and Case Closure - TimingSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1107
    (HB1522 / CH0461)
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary RelocationSenator BensonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.